Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Gomes Ferreira

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1851Born
19 Jul 187423.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 188735.7AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
21 Aug 188736.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
4 May 189745.9DiedBishop of Cochin, India

MicroData Summary for João Gomes Ferreira (VIAF: 99723883)
Bishop João Gomes Ferreira (born , died ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguiar de Sousa, Diocese of Porto, Portugal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Macau, Diocese of Macau, China

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 42
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast