Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Gerboin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Unianyembé, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1847Born
30 May 187427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
28 Jan 189749.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Unianyembé, Tanzania
28 Jan 189749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
21 Nov 189750.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
27 Jun 191265.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Unianyembé, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for François Gerboin
Bishop François Gerboin M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Unianyembé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaval, Diocese of Laval, France
Ordained BishopBukumki

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • tit: CB, 31 Jul 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017