Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert-Emmanuel de Beaumanoir de Lavardin

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
13 Nov 164831.8SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
1 Mar 164932.1ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
25 Apr 164932.3Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
27 Jul 167154.5DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philibert-Emmanuel de Beaumanoir de Lavardin
Bishop Philibert-Emmanuel de Beaumanoir de Lavardin (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalicorne

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast