Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cambiaso

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1865BornGenova
3 Sep 188924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
22 Jan 191549.6AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
21 Mar 191549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
6 Jan 194680.6DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cambiaso:
Bishop Angelo Cambiaso (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 44
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013