Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés García Palomares

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1758Born
6 Jun 178426.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 181557.6AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
23 Jun 181658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
31 May 182365.0DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés García Palomares
Bishop Andrés García Palomares (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 20
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 133, Number 716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast