Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan García Benito

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1752³Born
24 Jul 179745.0AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
22 Oct 179745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
29 Aug 182270.1SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
27 Sep 182270.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
8 Jul 182471.9ResignedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Sep 182573.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Benito
Archbishop Juan García Benito (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Marina de Torre

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 115, Number 602
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 14
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast