Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín Company Soler, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1732Born
174815.9ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
18 Dec 179765.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
4 Mar 179866.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
11 Aug 180068.6AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Nov 180068.8InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
13 Feb 181381.1DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Company Soler
Archbishop Joaquín Company Soler O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenáguila

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 116, Number 608
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast