Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vila y Campos

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1747Born
18 Dec 179750.2AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
11 Mar 179850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
20 Dec 180255.2AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
30 Nov 180760.1DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vila y Campos
Bishop Antonio Vila y Campos (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudadela

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 116, Number 611
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast