Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Hermida y Gamba (Camba)

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1755Born
26 Aug 180651.5AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
19 Oct 180651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
10 Nov 181459.8DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Hermida y Gamba (Camba)
Bishop Gregorio Hermida y Gamba (Camba) (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Rubián

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,704
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 126, Number 673
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast