Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand Olier, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1851BornMarzials, commune de Montjaux, France
8 Aug 188029.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
22 Dec 190352.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
22 Dec 190352.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
17 Apr 190452.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
9 Sep 190655.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
17 Sep 191160.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

MicroData Summary for Armand Olier:
Bishop Armand Olier S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015