Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Pappafava

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1693Born
27 Jun 172329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
6 Apr 176167.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
31 May 176167.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
18 Feb 177076.1DiedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Pappafava
Bishop Alessandro Pappafava (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,693
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast