Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Antonio Giustiniani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1712Born
1 Jul 173624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Aug 175341.1SelectedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
26 Nov 175341.4ConfirmedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
30 Nov 175341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
12 Feb 175946.6AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
14 Dec 177260.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
8 Feb 177360.6InstalledBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
12 Nov 179684.3DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Antonio Giustiniani
Bishop NicolÚ Antonio Giustiniani O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330, and Page 410
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,753, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast