Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Condulmer

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1726Born
25 Apr 175629.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 177043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
22 Jun 178558.7DiedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Condulmer
Bishop Francesco Condulmer (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 29.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast