Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Mora, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1706BornVenezia
20 Dec 173832.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Feb 174841.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
17 Mar 174841.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
2 Oct 175852.2AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
15 Jan 176659.4DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Mora:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Mora C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 66, and Page 212
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013