Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Maria Fuchs

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cibyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1876Born
31 Mar 190023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
13 Jul 193558.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
13 Jul 193558.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
24 Aug 193558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibyra
8 Apr 194467.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert Maria Fuchs
Bishop Albert Maria Fuchs (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoblenz

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast