Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corneille-François de Nélis

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1736³BornMalines
20 Sep 176024.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 178448.4SelectedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
14 Feb 178548.7ConfirmedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
5 Jun 178549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
21 Aug 179862.2DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corneille-François de Nélis:
Bishop Corneille-François de Nélis (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1789
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013