Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Thomas-Joseph Wellens

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1726³BornAntwerpen
18 Sep 175125.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 177649.6SelectedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
15 Jul 177649.8ConfirmedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
8 Sep 177650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
30 Jan 178457.4DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Thomas-Joseph Wellens:
Bishop Jacques-Thomas-Joseph Wellens (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1781
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015