Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Govaart-Geeraard van Eersel

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1713³BornAnvers
20 Dec 173824.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 177157.9SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
30 Mar 177258.2ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
9 Aug 177258.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
24 May 177864.4DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Govaart-Geeraard van Eersel:
Bishop Govaart-Geeraard van Eersel (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1772, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015