Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Jesús Fernández y Barragán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abad de Guadalupe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1865BornHacienda de Santa Inés
20 Sep 189025.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 189933.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
15 Apr 189933.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
26 May 189933.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
24 Oct 190843.3SucceededBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
1909¹43.5ResignedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
11 Nov 192156.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
31 Oct 192863.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Fernández y Barragán:
Archbishop José de Jesús Fernández y Barragán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 557, and Page 601
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,757

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013