Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Castellanos y Castellanos

Deceased

Bishop of Tabasco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1862BornEcuandureo
20 Mar 188623.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 190845.8AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
27 Sep 190845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
5 Oct 190845.9InstalledBishop of Tabasco, México
19 May 191249.5DiedBishop of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Castellanos y Castellanos:
Bishop Leonardo Castellanos y Castellanos (born , died ) Bishop of Tabasco

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,038
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 55
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013