Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Fernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1915BornHyderabad
20 Dec 194227.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 196751.5AppointedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
29 Jun 196751.8Ordained BishopBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
25 Jun 197054.7AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
15 Dec 197560.2ResignedBishop of Allahabad, India
27 Jan 198367.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Alfred Fernández:
Bishop Alfred Fernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015