Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Feeny

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1790²Born
10 Jul 181727.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 183949.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Killala, Ireland
30 Jul 183949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
13 Oct 183949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
11 Jan 184858.0AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
9 Jun 187383.4DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Feeny
Bishop Thomas Feeny (born 1790, died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrossboyne, Claremorris

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68, and Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,839, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast