Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Joseph Plunkett Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1795¹BornDangan House, Kilmore
1818¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 183136.6AppointedBishop of Galway, Ireland
23 Oct 183136.8Ordained BishopBishop of Galway, Ireland
26 Mar 184449.2AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1 Dec 185863.9DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Joseph Plunkett Browne
Bishop George Joseph Plunkett Browne (born 1795, died ) Bishop of Elphin

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016