Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence O’Donnell

Deceased

Bishop of Galway, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777¹Born
27 Sep 184467.7AppointedBishop of Galway, Ireland
28 Oct 184568.8Ordained BishopBishop of Galway, Ireland
29 Jun 185578.4DiedBishop of Galway, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurence O’Donnell
Bishop Laurence O’Donnell (born 1777, died ) Bishop of Galway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOldchapel, Oughterard
Ordained BishopCathedral, Galway, Diocese of Galway

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1846
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,063
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 46
  • by: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast