Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Durcan

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1790Born
27 May 182030.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 185262.6AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
30 Nov 185262.8Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
1 May 187585.2DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Durcan
Bishop Patrick Durcan (born , died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmactigue

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast