Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Song Wei-li, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of [Langfang (Patriotic), China]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1913Born
1945²31.6EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
1946²32.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
17 Feb 198268.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
19 Sep 198774.3AppointedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
1993²79.6AppointedBishop of [Langfang (Patriotic), China]
20 Jul 199683.1DiedBishop of [Langfang (Patriotic), China]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Song Wei-li
Bishop Paul Song Wei-li C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Langfang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Anguo [Ankwo]
Death PlaceXigao

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,731
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast