Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-René Boussen

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1774BornFurnes
21 Dec 180531.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Dec 183258.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Dec 183258.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
27 Jan 183358.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
23 Jun 183459.6AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
1 Oct 184873.8DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for François-René Boussen:
Bishop François-René Boussen (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 119, and Page 315
  • c134: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014