Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Esquirro

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
8 Nov 167757.8AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
1678¹58.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
8 Feb 168060.1SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
15 Jul 168060.5ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
1681¹61.0DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Esquirro
Bishop Serafino Esquirro (born 1620, died 1681) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124, and Page 401
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast