Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Alagón y de Cardona

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1631BornCagliari
5 Aug 166938.6AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
14 Sep 167039.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
15 Jan 167241.0AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
2 Oct 168453.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mallorca, Spain
3 May 170170.3DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Alagón y de Cardona:
Archbishop Pedro de Alagón y de Cardona (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 206, Number 1,287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013