Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edendon

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1346AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
14 May 1346Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
10 May 1366AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 1366DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for William Edendon:
Bishop William Edendon (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 14
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013