Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Stratford

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1337SelectedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
23 Oct 1337ConfirmedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 1337Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 1362DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Stratford
Bishop Robert Stratford (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast