Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simon Cardinal Langham, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1315¹BornLangham
10 Jan 136247.0AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 136247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
24 Jul 136651.6AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 136853.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 136853.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
27 Nov 136853.9ResignedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
Aug 1373³58.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
22 Jul 137661.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Langham:
Cardinal Simon Langham O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 78
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 335, and Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013