Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Stratford

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jun 1323AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
26 Jun 1323Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
18 Nov 1333SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
23 Apr 1334ConfirmedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1348DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stratford:
Archbishop John Stratford (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 17
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013