Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Stratford

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jan 1340SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
12 Mar 1340Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
7 Apr 1354DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Stratford
Bishop Ralph Stratford (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 291
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast