Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John de Saint Paul

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1349AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
14 Feb 1350Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
9 Sep 1362DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John de Saint Paul
Archbishop John de Saint Paul (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast