Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vital Cardinal Du Four

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1260¹BornBazas, France
23 Dec 131253.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
23 Dec 131253.0Elevated to Cardinal
Jun 1321³61.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Jun 132161.5Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
16 Aug 132767.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vital Du Four:
Vital Cardinal Du Four (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014