Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Barnet

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1362AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1362Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 1363AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
15 Dec 1366AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
7 Jun 1373DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Barnet:
Bishop John Barnet (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 78
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 58
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 138, and Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013