Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Percy

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1355AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
3 Jan 1356Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
8 Aug 1369DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Percy:
Bishop Thomas Percy (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 464
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013