Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Northburgh

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1354AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 1355Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
9 Sep 1361DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Northburgh
Bishop Michael Northburgh (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 291
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018