Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Islip

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1349AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 1349Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
26 Apr 1366DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon Islip
Archbishop Simon Islip (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 19
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast