Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Lewiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1783BornLewinko
16 Feb 180622.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182642.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
3 Jul 182642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
17 Sep 182643.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
1854¹70.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lewiński:
Bishop Francesco Lewiński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013