Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Stanislaw Czyżewski

Deceased

Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1753BornKalisz
26 Aug 176714.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Jul 177320.2IncardinatedPriest
29 May 182067.0AppointedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
6 Aug 182067.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
11 Dec 182370.6DiedBishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Stanislaw Czyżewski:
Bishop Ignacy Stanislaw Czyżewski (born , died ) Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,026
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013