Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wawrzyniec Gutowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Gerasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1758³Born
25 May 178223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
15 Dec 182870.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
15 Dec 182870.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
10 May 182970.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
24 Feb 183879.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wawrzyniec Gutowski (VIAF: 308777523)
Bishop Wawrzyniec Gutowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChyliny

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast