Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop GaspŰr Thaši

Deceased

Archbishop of ShkodrŰ, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1889Born
27 Jan 193647.0AppointedArchbishop of ShkodrŰ, Albania
19 Mar 193647.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of ShkodrŰ, Albania
25 May 194657.3DiedArchbishop of ShkodrŰ, Albania

MicroData Summary for GaspŰr Thaši
Archbishop GaspŰr Thaši (born , died ) Archbishop of ShkodrŰ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŰ

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,947
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,233
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast