Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildephonse-René Dordillon, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1808Born
2 Jul 183223.7Ordained PriestPriest
1837¹28.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
7 Dec 185547.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Dec 185547.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
8 Feb 185748.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
11 Jan 188879.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildephonse-René Dordillon (VIAF: 73847222)
Bishop Ildephonse-René Dordillon SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Maure de Touraine, Archdiocese of Tours, France
Ordained BishopEl Salvador, Valparaiso
Death PlaceTaiohae

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 8
  • b: CB, 15 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 16 Mar 2019

Quantcast