Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Cabbigat Dimoc

Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Bapara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1969 Born
19 May 199829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
6 May 201546.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
6 May 201546.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bapara
4 Aug 201546.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bapara

MicroData Summary for Valentin Cabbigat Dimoc
Bishop Valentin Cabbigat Dimoc (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagawe

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast