Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Parente

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1877Born
1 Apr 191133.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 192648.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
4 Aug 192648.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
19 Sep 192648.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
1929²51.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Capua, Italy
25 Sep 193557.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Parente
Bishop Eduardo Parente (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,006
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast