Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Josť da Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1791Born
20 Dec 181726.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 184654.1SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
16 Apr 184654.3ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
14 Jun 184654.5Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
16 Jul 185159.5DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Josť da Costa
Bishop Manuel Josť da Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBanho
Ordained BishopInglezinhos, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,091
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1846, Number 29
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast