Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Darabanth, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1738³BornVicsa
Jun 1765³26.5Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Mar 178950.4AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
13 Mar 179051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
31 Oct 180567.0DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Darabanth
Bishop Ignatius Darabanth O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016