Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas D’Antonio Salza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Giufi Salaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1916Born
7 Jun 194225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Dec 196347.4AppointedPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
19 Apr 196649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi Salaria
25 Jul 196650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi Salaria
6 Aug 197761.0ResignedPrelate of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras
1 Aug 200993.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Nicholas D’Antonio Salza
Bishop Nicholas D’Antonio Salza O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochester, NY, Diocese of Rochester, New York, USA
Ordained PriestAndover, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast